OR SB154 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-21 - Effective date, August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-21 - Effective date, August 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires organization or entity that pays persons to obtain signatures on election petitions to register with Secretary of State.
Title
Relating to election petitions; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-21 | Senate | Effective date, August 14, 2013. |
2013-08-21 | Senate | Chapter 759, 2013 Laws. |
2013-08-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-07-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-06-28 | House | Third reading. Carried by Garrett. Passed. Ayes, 35; Nays, 23--Bentz, Berger, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Smith, Sprenger, Thompson, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 1--Thatcher; Excused for Business of the House, 1--McLane. |
2013-06-27 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-06-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-05-29 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2013-05-29 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Rosenbaum. Passed. Ayes, 16; nays, 14--Baertschiger, Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Starr, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Taken from 05-22 Calendar and placed on 05-28 Calendar on voice vote. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Taken from 05-15 Calendar and placed on 05-22 Calendar on voice vote. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Taken from 05-08 Calendar and placed on 05-15 Calendar on voice vote. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |