OR SB1539 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes pilot program to provide funding to school districts for purposes of increasing access to schools by homeless students and improving academic achievement of homeless students. Establishes pilot program to provide funding to school districts for purposes of increasing access to schools by homeless students and improving academic achievement of homeless students. Directs Department of Education to award grants to school districts participating in pilot program from Statewide Education Initiatives Account. Sunsets pilot program July 1, 2025. Directs Department of Education to submit report on homeless students, including pilot program, to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to education. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to homeless youth; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Withdraw from Committee (Y: 9 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Finance and Revenue by prior reference (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Finance and Revenue by prior reference (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Motion to withdraw from committee on Finance and Revenue failed. Ayes, 9; Nays, 18--Armitage, Beyer, Dembrow, Frederick, Gelser Blouin, Golden, Gorsek, Jama, Lawrence Spence, Lieber, Manning Jr, Patterson, President Courtney, Prozanski, Sollman, Steiner Hayward, Taylor, Wagner; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 2--Boquist, Robinson. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue by prior reference. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Finance and Revenue by prior reference. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Education, then Finance and Revenue. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |