OR SB1539 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Oregon Psychiatric Access Line program in Oregon Health and Science University. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to telephone access by primary care providers to psychiatric physician consultations; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Health Care, then Ways and Means. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |