OR SB1539 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Effective date, March 3, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-07 - Effective date, March 3, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires state contracting agencies to provide State Chief Information Officer and Legislative Fiscal Office with certain materials in connection with cost analysis that state contracting agency performs to determine whether to conduct information technology procurement or determination as to procurement's feasibility. Exempts Secretary of State and State Treasurer from requirement to provide some materials to State Chief Information Officer. Requires State Chief Information Officer to adopt rules and develop policies to incorporate materials into State Chief Information Officer's oversight and planning functions related to information technology. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to materials that state contracting agencies must provide in connection with an information technology procurement; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-02-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-07 | Senate | Effective date, March 3, 2016. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Chapter 016, 2016 Laws. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-02-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-02-23 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nearman. Passed.Ayes, 53; Nays, 1--Weidner; Excused, 3--Gilliam, Gorsek, Vega Pederson; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Gomberg, Read, Witt. |
2016-02-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 23, 2016 Calendar. |
2016-02-19 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 22, 2016 Calendar. |
2016-02-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 19, 2016 Calendar. |
2016-02-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 18, 2016 Calendar. |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to February 17, 2016 Calendar. |
2016-02-15 | House | Second reading. |
2016-02-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Information Management and Technology. |
2016-02-10 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 2--Olsen, Thomsen; excused, 2--Bates, Winters. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Information Management and Technology. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |