OR SB1538 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Effective date, April 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Effective date, April 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires state agencies to notify Legislative Fiscal Office concerning information security assessments and information security incidents . Requires state agencies to notify Legislative Fiscal Office promptly] concerning information security assessments and information security incidents and provide office with copies of and report results of information security assessments]. Requires heads of certain state agencies to provide annual report concerning information security to Joint Legislative Committee on Information Management and Technology. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to information security for the State of Oregon; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Senate | Effective date, April 4, 2016. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Chapter 110, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nearman. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 2--Greenlick, Weidner; Excused, 2--Davis, Olson. |
2016-03-01 | House | Second reading. |
2016-02-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2016-02-26 | House | Referred to Information Management and Technology. |
2016-02-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed.Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Hansell, Shields, Winters. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Information Management and Technology. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |