OR SB1537 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Effective date, April 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Effective date, April 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes criteria by which school district may establish post-graduate scholar program to receive and expend certain State School Fund moneys for certain students who have satisfied requirements for high school diploma. Sunsets June 30, 2021. Directs Department of Education and Higher Education Coordinating Commission to submit reports related to programs to interim legislative committees on education. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to payment for community college courses by school districts; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Senate | Effective date, April 4, 2016. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Chapter 109, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Komp. Passed.Ayes, 47; Nays, 11--Barreto, Buehler, Gilliam, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Nearman, Post, Weidner; Excused, 2--Davis, Olson. |
2016-03-01 | House | Second reading. |
2016-02-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2016-02-26 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2016-02-26 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Boquist, Winters. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |