OR SB1534 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes operative date earlier for provisions requiring Commissioner of the Bureau of Labor and Industries to prepare formal charges and pursue matters in court on behalf of complainants who allege discrimination in real property transactions.
Title
Relating to discretion of the Commissioner of the Bureau of Labor and Industries to pursue matters on behalf of certain complainants.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass and request referral to Ways and Means. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |