OR SB1534 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Effective date, January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Department of Human Services to establish minimum training standards for home care workers and personal support workers and to provide training. Directs department and Home Care Commission to maximize federal funding available to pay for training. Becomes operative January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to training for care providers.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-11SenateEffective date, January 1, 2019.
2018-04-11SenateChapter 75, 2018 Laws.
2018-04-03SenateGovernor signed.
2018-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2018-03-03SenatePresident signed.
2018-03-01HouseThird reading. Carried by Kennemer. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 2--Nearman, Reschke; Excused, 1--Gorsek.
2018-02-28HouseSecond reading.
2018-02-27HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2018-02-26HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2018-02-20HouseReferred to Business and Labor.
2018-02-19HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2018-02-19SenateThird reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Hansell, Kruse, Riley.
2018-02-16SenateSecond reading.
2018-02-15SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2018-02-13SenateWork Session held.
2018-02-06SenatePublic Hearing held.
2018-02-05SenateReferred to Workforce.
2018-02-05SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
2018-01-22SenatePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback