OR SB1528 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Updates connection date to federal Internal Revenue Code and other provisions of federal tax law. Expands types of expenses, in conformity with federal law, for which use of withdrawal from higher education savings network account is qualified withdrawal for purpose of tax-advantaged treatment. Conforms age limits, applicable to retirement and to commencing payment of benefits, to federal law, for purposes of Public Employees Retirement System. Applies to transactions or activities occurring on or after January 1, 2020, in tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to connection to federal tax law; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-02-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2020-02-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2020-02-19 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2020-02-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Boquist. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Findley. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Burdick. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Second reading. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |