OR SB1528 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Effective date, April 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Effective date, April 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires members of Commission on Indian Services who are not members of Legislative Assembly to be selected by tribal governing bodies. Requires members of Commission on Indian Services who are not members of Legislative Assembly to be appointed from nominees] selected by tribal councils] governing bodies. Provides that majority of members of commission who are not members of Legislative Assembly does not constitute quorum during certain gatherings. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the Commission on Indian Services; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Ferrioli [R] | Sen. Peter Courtney [D] | Sen. Bill Hansell [R] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] |
Rep. Caddy McKeown [D] | Rep. Duane Stark [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Senate | Effective date, April 4, 2016. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Chapter 108, 2016 Laws. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-03-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-02-26 | House | Third reading. Carried by McKeown. Passed.Ayes, 54; Excused, 4--Boone, Heard, Smith, Witt; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Davis, Nathanson. |
2016-02-25 | House | Second reading. |
2016-02-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2016-02-24 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2016-02-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Ferrioli, Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Winters. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Second reading. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Possible Work Session cancelled. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |