OR SB1528 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Effective date, March 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-20 - Effective date, March 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to liquor enforcement inspectors; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to liquor enforcement inspectors; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Effective date, March 16, 2012. | |
2012-03-20 | Chapter 54, 2012 Laws. | |
2012-03-16 | Governor signed. | |
2012-03-01 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2012-02-29 | President signed. | |
2012-02-27 | Third reading. Carried by Barker. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 8--Freeman, Gilliam, Hicks, Johnson, Lindsay, McLane, Richardson, Thatcher. | |
2012-02-24 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-23 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2012-02-22 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-17 | Referred to Judiciary. | |
2012-02-17 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2012-02-17 | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 30. | |
2012-02-16 | Second reading. | |
2012-02-15 | Recommendation: Without recommendation, but with amendments, and be referred to Ways and Means (Printed A-Eng.) Referral denied by order of the President. | |
2012-02-06 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Judiciary. | |
2012-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |