OR SB1527 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Effective date, March 27, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to crime; and declaring an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to crime; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-27 Effective date, March 27, 2012.
2012-03-27 Chapter 82, 2012 Laws.
2012-03-27 Governor signed.
2012-03-01 Co-Speakers signed.
2012-02-29 President signed.
2012-02-28 Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Devlin, Dingfelder, George.
2012-02-27 Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 59; Absent, 1--Whisnant.
2012-02-24 Second reading.
2012-02-23 Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2012-02-22 Work Session held.
2012-02-20 Work Session held.
2012-02-16 Public Hearing held.
2012-02-14 Referred to Judiciary.
2012-02-14 First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers.
2012-02-13 Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 30.
2012-02-10 Second reading.
2012-02-09 Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2012-02-06 Public Hearing and Work Session held.
2012-02-01 Referred to Judiciary.
2012-02-01 Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback