OR SB1525 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Effective date, April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Grants Higher Education Coordinating Commission authority to enter into and administer interstate agreements regarding provision of post-secondary distance education. Clarifies relationship between Higher Education Coordinating Commission and Oregon Education Investment Board. Revises composition of State Board of Higher Education. Prevents faculty and nonfaculty staff members of university governing board from taking part in board discussions relating to collective bargaining. Clarifies legislative intent on how constitutional references to State Board of Higher Education are interpreted. Clarifies applicability of PERS to universities with governing boards. Revises date by which Eastern Oregon University, Oregon Institute of Technology, Southern Oregon University and Western Oregon University must notify State Board of Education of their intent to become universities with governing boards. Clarifies that registering to vote in Oregon will not affect eligibility of out-of-state student to participate in Western Undergraduate Exchange. Reestablishes work group to explore options for optimal regional education delivery systems. Sunsets work group on date of convening of 2015 regular session of Legislative Assembly. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to education; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-03SenateEffective date, April 1, 2014.
2014-04-03SenateChapter 113, 2014 Laws.
2014-04-01SenateGovernor signed.
2014-03-06HouseSpeaker signed.
2014-03-06SenatePresident signed.
2014-03-05SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 16; nays, 14--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Starr, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters.
2014-03-03HouseThird reading. Carried by Harker. Passed.Ayes, 43; Nays, 15--Bentz, Cameron, Conger, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Sprenger, Thatcher, Whisnant; Excused, 2--Berger, Weidner.
2014-02-28HouseRules suspended. Carried over to March 3, 2014 Calendar.
2014-02-27HouseSecond reading.
2014-02-26HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2014-02-25HouseWork Session held.
2014-02-24HouseWork Session held.
2014-02-21HousePublic Hearing held.
2014-02-18HouseReferred to Higher Education and Workforce Development.
2014-02-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2014-02-14SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 29; nays, 1--Boquist.
2014-02-14SenateSecond reading.
2014-02-13SenateSubsequent referral rescinded by order of the President.
2014-02-13SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.)
2014-02-06SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2014-02-03SenateReferred to Education and Workforce Development, then Ways and Means.
2014-02-03SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/Overview/SB1525
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1525/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1525/Senate%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1525/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1525/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1525/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1525/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/19925
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=316714
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20211
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=318579
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=318884

Bill Comments

feedback