OR SB1522 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Effective date, March 23, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-01 - Effective date, March 23, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes high school teachers who are employed by education service districts to serve as members of Transfer Council. Authorizes high school teachers who are employed by education service districts to serve as members of Transfer Council. Directs public universities and community colleges to charge eligible veterans in-state tuition for certain distance education courses. Expands eligibility for in-state tuition to include individuals who are granted humanitarian parole, asylum, conditional permanent residency or temporary protected status by any federal agency, provided that individual has not previously established residence in any state or territory of United States or District of Columbia. Requires graduate student employees at public university to sign form allowing university to release specified contact information. Requires school districts and public charter schools to accept credits earned by students in specified educational programs and to apply those credits to high school graduation requirements. Provides that appropriate education for children enrolled in educational program under Youth Corrections Education Program or Juvenile Detention Education Program includes transition services. Allows for modifications to or exemptions from requirements related to provision of menstrual products in certain student bathrooms. Requires provision of menstrual products in alternate location when public education provider does not have control of student bathrooms. Allows high school equivalency student, homeschooled student or student who attends public charter school to meet academic eligibility requirements for participation in interscholastic activities after student demonstrates that student meets specified academic standards and specified amount of time has passed. Expands protections of right to participate in interscholastic athletics to students of all high school equivalency programs. Directs Department of Corrections to develop plan and to provide online access to educational programs for adults in custody at Coffee Creek Correctional Facility and Snake River Correctional Institution. Modifies eligibility requirements and award amounts for Oregon Promise program. Allows Superintendent of Public Instruction to grant waiver of physical education requirements if school district or public charter school is unable to meet requirements because of human-created disaster or natural disaster. Prohibits marijuana retailer or medical marijuana dispensary from being located within 1,000 feet of building where public prekindergarten or kindergarten program is provided by school district or education service district. Modifies calculation of salary paid to active member of Public Employees Retirement System if member is public charter school employee, member was informed in writing that member was eligible to participate in system and public charter school made contributions to system on member's behalf. Modifies determination of eligibility for part-time faculty member of public institution of higher education for purpose of health care benefits. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to education; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | Senate | Effective date, March 23, 2022. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Chapter 81, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-03-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Alonso Leon. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 20--Bonham, Breese-Iverson, Cate, George, Goodwin, Hieb, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 2--Boshart Davis, Scharf. |
2022-03-02 | House | Second reading. |
2022-03-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2022-03-01 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2022-03-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 4--Findley, Girod, Linthicum, Thomsen; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 3--Boquist, Frederick, Robinson. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Informational Meeting held. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |