OR SB1522 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies definition of "sexual conduct" for purposes of requirements for education providers related to abuse of and sexual conduct toward students. Modifies confidentiality requirements related to documents, materials and reports produced by Teacher Standards and Practices Commission and Department of Education when conducting investigation related to licensed school employee, contractor, agent or volunteer. Requires members of education service district board to be mandatory reporters of abuse of children. Provides that, for school years prior to 2021-2022 school year only, school districts are not required to comply with requirement that students in grades six through eight participate in physical education for entire school year. Provides that public education provider may hold executive session in certain instances involving allegations of sexual violence, sexual conduct or sexual harassment by public officer, employee, staff member or individual agent of public education provider. Provides for remuneration paid to certain employees of public charter school who reside and perform service in United States to be treated as if remuneration were includable in employee's taxable income during continuous period of employment with public charter school. Allows certain schools to continue to qualify as remote small elementary school or small high school and to receive additional distribution from State School Fund for 2020-2021 school year only. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to education; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2020-02-26 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-08HouseAt Desk upon adjournment.
2020-02-26HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2020-02-26HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2020-02-21HouseReferred to Rules.
2020-02-21HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2020-02-18SenateVote explanation filed by Boquist.
2020-02-18SenateThird reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 30.
2020-02-17SenateTaken from 02-17 Calendar and placed on 02-18 Calendar by unanimous consent.
2020-02-13SenateSecond reading.
2020-02-12SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2020-02-11SenateWork Session held.
2020-02-04SenatePublic Hearing held.
2020-02-03SenateReferred to Education.
2020-02-03SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.
2020-01-27SenatePresession Released to the Public.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback