OR SB1521 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extends sunset of open enrollment by one year.
Title
Relating to student transfers in public kindergarten through grade 12.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate Motion to Refer (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Motion to refer to Rules carried. Ayes, 14; Nays, 11--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, DeBoer, Girod, Knopp, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen, Winters; Excused, 5--Hansell, Johnson, Kruse, Riley, Roblan. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Carried over to 02-16 by unanimous consent. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |