OR SB1515 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Effective date, April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expands list of prior violations that prohibit individual from becoming circulator. Establishes work group to examine feasibility of Internet voting. Requires work group to report findings to Legislative Assembly before December 1, 2014.Ù Amends time period for which circulator's criminal records check is valid. Permits name of candidate nominated for more than one district office to appear on ballot more than once. Permits elector who submitted ballot in unsigned return identification envelope to remain on active voter registration rolls. Resolves discrepancy regarding day on which challenged ballot records may be released to public. Resolves certification date discrepancy for write-in ballots. Limits prohibition on electioneering to business hours. Permits person to show person's own marked ballot to another person. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to elections; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-03SenateEffective date, April 1, 2014.
2014-04-03SenateChapter 112, 2014 Laws.
2014-04-01SenateGovernor signed.
2014-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2014-03-11SenatePresident signed.
2014-03-07SenateUnder rules susupension, Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 19; nays, 11--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Thomsen, Whitsett.
2014-03-07HouseThird reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed.Ayes, 34; Nays, 23--Bentz, Cameron, Conger, Davis, Esquivel, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Huffman, Jenson, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Richardson, Smith, Sprenger, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 2--Keny-Guyer, Thompson; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Buckley.
2014-03-06HouseSecond reading.
2014-03-05HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2014-03-05HouseWork Session held.
2014-02-26HouseWork Session held.
2014-02-21HouseReferred to Rules.
2014-02-21HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2014-02-20SenateThird reading. Carried by Starr. Passed.Ayes, 18; nays, 11--Baertschiger Jr, Close, Edwards, George, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 1--Boquist.
2014-02-19SenateSecond reading.
2014-02-19SenateSubsequent referral rescinded by order of the President.
2014-02-19SenateRecommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded.
2014-02-18SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2014-02-03SenateReferred to Rules, then Ways and Means.
2014-02-03SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/Overview/SB1515
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1515/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1515/House%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1515/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1515/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20113
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=317340
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20280
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=319194
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2014R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=319222

Bill Comments

feedback