OR SB1514 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Effective date, April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Until July 1, 2015, increases percentage of moneys distributed for county parks from 35 percent to 40 percent of moneys transferred to State Parks and Recreation Department from registration of travel trailers, campers and motor homes and from recreational vehicle trip permits. Beginning July 1, 2015, increases percentage of moneys distributed for county parks from 40 percent to 45 percent. Modifies biennial expenditures from fees, moneys or other revenues, including Miscellaneous Receipts, but excluding lottery funds and federal funds, collected or received by department for acquisition, development, maintenance, care and use of county park and recreation sites. Increases expenditure limitation from lottery moneys allocated from Parks and Natural Resources Fund to department for direct services. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the distribution of moneys to counties from the State Parks and Recreation Department Fund; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2014-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-03SenateEffective date, April 1, 2014.
2014-04-03SenateChapter 111, 2014 Laws.
2014-04-01SenateGovernor signed.
2014-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2014-03-07SenatePresident signed.
2014-03-06HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Unger. Passed.Ayes, 55; Excused, 3--Berger, Boone, Weidner; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Read, Williamson.
2014-03-06HouseSecond reading.
2014-03-05HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2014-03-05HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2014-03-05HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2014-03-05SenateThird reading. Carried by Edwards. Passed.Ayes, 30.
2014-03-04SenateSecond reading.
2014-03-03SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2014-02-28SenateWork Session held.
2014-02-25SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2014-02-25SenateWork Session held.
2014-02-20SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
2014-02-05SenateRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2014-02-04SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2014-02-03SenateReferred to Rural Communities and Economic Development, then Ways and Means.
2014-02-03SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback