OR SB1513 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of Environmental Quality or State Department of Agriculture approval as prerequisite to construction or installation of qualifying operation. Requires State Department of Agriculture confirmation of water supply legal authorization prior to issuance of final approval of qualifying operation by department or Department of Environmental Quality. Limits fees for approvals. Requires that permit for qualifying operation located in ground water management area and applying animal waste to land be issued as individual permit. Authorizes Department of Environmental Quality and State Department of Agriculture to clean, repurpose or decommission vacated, abandoned or unpermitted qualifying operation. Specifies that permit requirement for activities increasing effluent in manner not already lawfully authorized applies to concentrated animal feeding operations. Appropriates moneys to State Department of Agriculture for biennium ending June 30, 2021, for purpose of adopting rules to carry out regulation of operations. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to livestock operations; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Rules (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Rules (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill, request referral to Ways and Means. Refer to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Rules. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |