OR SB1513 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires student to correctly answer specified percentage of questions on civics test before being eligible to receive high school diploma. Takes effect July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to tests required for high school diplomas; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2018R1/Measures/Overview/SB1513 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2018R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1513/Introduced |