OR SB1509 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Effective date, June 3, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Effective date, June 3, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that portion of Oregon Route 35, beginning where highway intersects with U.S. Highway 26 and ending where highway intersects with U.S. Highway 30, shall also be known as Oregon Nisei Veterans World War II Memorial Highway. Provides that portion of Oregon Route 35, beginning where highway intersects with U.S. Highway 26 and ending where highway intersects with U.S. Highway 30, shall also be known as Oregon Nisei Veterans World War II Historic] Memorial Highway. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to Nisei veterans; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Senate | Effective date, June 3, 2022. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Chapter 21, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2022-02-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-02-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-02-24 | House | Work Session cancelled. |
2022-02-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williams. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--George, Zika. |
2022-02-23 | House | Second reading. |
2022-02-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2022-02-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-14 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Management. |
2022-02-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Thomsen, Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 22; Absent, 1--Heard; Excused, 7--Boquist, Kennemer, Lawrence Spence, Linthicum, Robinson, Steiner Hayward, Thatcher. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Second reading. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |