OR SB1509 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides additional exception to prohibition on commercial vehicle idling. Modifies existing commercial vehicle idling exemptions. Permits local governments to regulate idling diesel primary engines in certain circumstances].
Title
Relating to vehicle idling.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill, and be referred to Rules. (Printed B-Eng) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2018-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2018-02-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed B-Engrossed, and be referred to Rules. |
2018-02-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2018-02-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2018-02-19 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Hansell, Kruse, Riley. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |