OR SB1509 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-10 - Effective date, March 6, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-10 - Effective date, March 6, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows district school board to enter into approved written agreement with federally recognized Native American tribe in Oregon for use of mascot that represents, is associated with or is significant to tribe. Permits district school board to enter into written agreement with federally recognized Native American tribe in Oregon to identify acceptable name, symbol or image of mascot that represents or is associated with Native American tribe, to identify behavior expectations at athletic events and to identify required training on cultural diversity. Requires agreement to describe acceptable uses of mascot, comply with State Board of Education rules and be approved by board. Requires board to approve agreement that meets requirements. Requires board to adopt rules by January 1, 2017. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to school mascots; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Sherrie Sprenger [R] | Sen. Jeff Kruse [R] | Rep. Betsy Close [R] | Sen. Fred Girod [R] |
Sen. Elizabeth Johnson [D] | Rep. Tim Freeman [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | Senate | Effective date, March 6, 2014. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Chapter 43, 2014 Laws. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-02-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-02-26 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sprenger. Passed.Ayes, 40; Nays, 18--Bailey, Barnhart, Barton, Berger, Buckley, Frederick, Gallegos, Gorsek, Greenlick, Harker, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, Lininger, Reardon, Smith Warner, Tomei, Unger, Williamson; Excused, 2--Hicks, Lively. |
2014-02-25 | House | Second reading. |
2014-02-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2014-02-24 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Education. |
2014-02-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Burdick. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Education and Workforce Development. |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |