OR SB1509 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Effective date, March 27, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to health; and declaring an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to health; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-27 Effective date, March 27, 2012.
2012-03-27 Chapter 80, 2012 Laws.
2012-03-27 Governor signed.
2012-03-06 Co-Speakers signed.
2012-03-05 President signed.
2012-03-01 Atkinson, Girod declared potential conflicts of interest.
2012-03-01 Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 26; excused, 4--Bates, Boquist, George, Winters.
2012-03-01 Motion to reconsider carried on voice vote.
2012-03-01 Representatives Freeman, Kotek appointed House conferees.
2012-03-01 Senators Bates, Monnes Anderson, Morse appointed Senate conferees.
2012-03-01 Girod declared potential conflict of interest.
2012-03-01 Senate refused to concur in House amendments. Ayes, 16; nays, 13--Atkinson, Boquist, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Kruse, Morse, Nelson, Olsen, Telfer, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters; excused, 1--Starr.
2012-02-27 Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Wingard. Passed. Ayes, 60.
2012-02-27 Second reading.
2012-02-24 Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed C-Engrossed.
2012-02-23 Work Session held.
2012-02-22 Referred to Rules.
2012-02-21 First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers.
2012-02-21 Atkinson, Girod declared potential conflict of interest.
2012-02-21 Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--George.
2012-02-21 Second reading.
2012-02-20 Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2012-02-17 Work Session held.
2012-02-16 Motion to refer to Rules carried on voice vote.
2012-02-15 Second reading.
2012-02-14 Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2012-02-13 Work Session held.
2012-02-10 Public Hearing held.
2012-02-08 Public Hearing held.
2012-02-01 Referred to Health Care, Human Services and Rural Health Policy.
2012-02-01 Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback