OR SB1502 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-08 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Agricultural Cooperative Member Low-Interest Loan Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in fund to State Department of Agriculture] Oregon Business Development Department for carrying out loan program. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to State Department of Agriculture for deposit in Agricultural Cooperative Member Low-Interest Loan Fund for biennium ending June 30, 2021.] Limits payment from lottery moneys allocated from Administrative Services Economic Development Fund to department for deposit in Agricultural Cooperative Member Low-Interest Loan Fund for biennium ending June 30, 2021. Authorizes State Department of Agriculture] department to make loans from fund to farmers that were members of agricultural cooperative on date that cooperative initiated bankruptcy proceedings. Specifies terms of loans. Requires State Department of Agriculture to assist with loan application evaluation if requested by Oregon Business Development Department. Authorizes State Department of Agriculture] Oregon Business Development Department to delegate application processing and loan servicing to lending institutions. Makes loan program operative January 1, 2021. Sunsets loan program and abolishes Agricultural Cooperative Member Low-Interest Loan Fund January 2, 2040. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to assistance for members of agricultural cooperative; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Courtney [D] | Sen. Fred Girod [R] | Sen. Leslee Beyer [D] | Sen. Tim Knopp [R] |
Sen. Laurie Monnes Anderson [D] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | Senate | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to General Government and Emergency Preparedness, then Ways and Means. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Presession Released to the Public. |