OR SB138 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, July 15, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, July 15, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reestablishes Mental Health Clinical Advisory Group in Oregon Health Authority to continue development of evidence-based algorithms for prescription drug treatment of mental health disorders. Specifies membership. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to prescription drug coverage in publicly financed programs; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-08 | Senate | Effective date, July 15, 2019. |
2019-08-08 | Senate | Chapter 544, 2019 Laws. |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Effective date, July 15, 2019. |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Chapter 544, 2019 Laws. |
2019-07-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-19 | House | Third reading. Carried by Noble. Passed. Ayes, 57; Absent, 1--Barreto; Excused, 1--Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Power. |
2019-06-18 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-06-17 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-17 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Heard. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |