OR SB13 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-10 - Effective date, August 2, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-10 - Effective date, August 2, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Education to develop curriculum relating to Native American experience in Oregon and to provide professional development related to curriculum. Requires school districts to implement curriculum. Directs department to make reports related to development of curriculum. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to Native American curriculum in schools; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-07-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-10 | Senate | Effective date, August 2, 2017. |
2017-08-10 | Senate | Chapter 632, 2017 Laws. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-07 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Sanchez. Passed.Ayes, 60. |
2017-07-06 | House | Rules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to July 7, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-07-06 | House | Second reading. |
2017-07-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-07-05 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-07-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-07-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-06-18 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Education, then Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |