OR SB129 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Chapter 481, 2017 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Chapter 481, 2017 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Advisory Committee to review, consider and report to interim legislative committees relating to veterans no later than February 1, 2018, regarding establishing task force on post-traumatic stress disorder. Sunsets December 31, 2018. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to a task force on post-traumatic stress disorder; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting subsequent referral to General Government and Accountability and Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting subsequent referral to General Government and Accountability and Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-04 | Senate | Chapter 481, 2017 Laws. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Effective date, October 6, 2017. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-06-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Post. Passed.Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Bentz, Boone, Smith Warner; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2017-06-13 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 14, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 13, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-08 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-07 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-06-01 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-05-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-20 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2017-04-19 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Carried over to 04-18 by unanimous consent. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and subsequent referral to General Government and Accountability and Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness, then General Government and Accountability, then Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |