OR SB128 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective date, May 20, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Effective date, May 20, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Board of Medical Imaging to issue permit to supervise fluoroscopy to qualified advanced practice registered nurse. Authorizes Board of Medical Imaging, Oregon State Board of Nursing and Oregon Health Authority to adopt rules. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to supervision of fluoroscopy; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | Effective date, May 20, 2019. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Chapter 128, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-05-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-09 | House | Third reading. Carried by Prusak. Passed. Ayes, 50; Nays, 8--Barreto, Findley, Lewis, Noble, Post, Reschke, Stark, Wilson; Excused, 1--Drazan; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2019-05-08 | House | Carried over to May 9, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 8, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-05-06 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 7, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-05-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 6, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-05-01 | House | Carried over to May 2, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-04-30 | House | Carried over to May 1, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-04-29 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-03-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Boquist. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 2--Boquist, Girod. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |