OR SB126 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Department of State Lands to expand estuarine research reserve management area to include other lands acquired by department connected to Coos Bay estuary. Allows Department of State Lands to expand estuarine research reserve management area to include other lands acquired by department connected to Coos Bay estuary. Updates references for name change of federal Office for Coastal Management.
Title
Relating to expanding estuarine research reserve management area.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 139, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-05-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith DB. Passed. Ayes, 52; Excused, 7--Breese-Iverson, Bynum, Holvey, Moore-Green, Noble, Power, Sanchez; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Boshart Davis. |
2021-05-19 | House | Carried over to May 20, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 19, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-17 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-27 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-07 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2021-04-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 2--Boquist, Heard. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources and Wildfire Recovery. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |