OR SB121 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes restrictions on hydroelectric electricity, including restriction that hydroelectric electricity be generated by facility that became operational on or after January 1, 1995, for purpose of qualifying for renewable portfolio standard.
Title
Relating to use of hydroelectric electricity to qualify for renewable portfolio standard.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |