OR SB110 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-05 - Effective date, May 5, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-05 - Effective date, May 5, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the agents of employing units; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to the agents of employing units; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-05 | Effective date, May 5, 2011. | |
2011-05-05 | Chapter 22, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-05-05 | Governor signed. | |
2011-05-04 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-05-03 | President signed. | |
2011-05-02 | Read third time under Consent Calendar. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Thatcher; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Berger. | |
2011-04-29 | Second reading. | |
2011-04-26 | Recommendation: Do pass and be placed on Consent Calendar. | |
2011-04-25 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Business and Labor. | |
2011-03-01 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-02-28 | Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Bates. | |
2011-02-24 | Second reading. | |
2011-02-24 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-02-23 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-14 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-14 | Referred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |