OR SB11 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires person who purchases residential real property after foreclosure complaint has been filed and before end of redemption period to provide notice to seller regarding relinquishment of interests in property and rights to surplus funds. Requires sheriff, before conducting execution sale of real property, to provide on website certain notice to debtor regarding offers to sell rights to surplus funds. Requires complaint in suit to foreclose residential trust deed to include notice to lien debtor regarding sales of redemption rights. Prohibits transferring right to redeem property to successor in interest by sale.].
Title
Relating to rights of redemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Chapter 309, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-30 | House | Third reading. Carried by Piluso. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Holvey, Rayfield. |
2019-05-29 | House | Carried over to May 30, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-28 | House | Carried over to May 29, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-27 | House | Carried over to May 28, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-23 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-04-16 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Fagan, Gelser. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |