OR SB1051 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-23 - Effective date, August 15, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-23 - Effective date, August 15, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires city with population greater than 5,000 or county with population greater than 25,000 to review and decide on applications for certain housing developments containing affordable housing units within 100 days. Establishes standards of review for city or county decision on application for certain housing developments located within urban growth boundary. Becomes operative July 1, 2018. Amends definition of "needed housing." Prohibits city or county from denying application for housing development that complies with clear and objective standards. Prohibits city or county from reducing density or height of application if density or height applied for is at or below authorized density for zone. Permits local government to apply clear and objective standards, conditions and procedures regulating development of housing that regulate density or height of development. Prohibits city with population greater than 2,500 or county with population greater than 15,000 from prohibiting building accessory dwelling unit in area zoned for single-family dwellings. Becomes operative July 1, 2018. Requires city and county to allow nonresidential place of worship to use real property for affordable housing. Requires local government to annually report to Department of Land Conservation and Development certain information relating to applications received for development of housing containing one or more units sold or rented below market rate as part of housing program. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to use of real property; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Kotek [D] | Rep. Duane Stark [R] | Rep. Janelle Bynum [D] | Rep. Julianne Fahey [D] |
Rep. Pam Marsh [D] | Senate Business And Transportation Committee |
Roll Calls
2017-07-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-23 | Senate | Effective date, August 15, 2017. |
2017-08-23 | Senate | Chapter 745, 2017 Laws. |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Knopp, Olsen declared potential conflict of interest. |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 23; nays, 6--Burdick, Gelser, Riley, Taylor, Thatcher, Thomsen; excused, 1--Linthicum. |
2017-07-06 | House | Third reading as Special Order of Business. Carried by Stark. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Boone. |
2017-07-05 | House | Second reading. |
2017-07-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-07-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-05-31 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2017-05-31 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2017-05-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-05-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-24 | House | Referred to Early Childhood and Family Supports. |
2017-04-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |