OR SB103 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-15 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Classifies dairies exceeding specified size as industrial facilities for purposes of right to farm laws, air pollution laws and land use laws. Provides that use of water for industrial dairy is industrial use. Allows local governments to adopt human health and safety ordinances restricting or prohibiting air and water emissions by dairies classified as industrial facilities. Prohibits Department of Environmental Quality and State Department of Agriculture from issuing permits for construction of new industrial dairy or for addition to, or expansion of, existing industrial dairy. Requires Environmental Quality Commission to adopt rules establishing program to regulate industrial dairy emissions into air. Requires commission to pattern program on recommendations in final report by Task Force on Dairy Air Quality. Requires implementation no later than January 1, 2021. Prohibits Department of Environmental Quality and State Department of Agriculture from issuing permits for industrial dairies unless applicant has water right permit having specified characteristics. Limits stockwatering exemption from water right permit requirements if user is industrial dairy. Requires applicant for permit to operate industrial dairy to post bond with State Department of Agriculture as security against environmental, health or animal welfare costs arising from operation of industrial dairy. Requires State Department of Agriculture to conduct study on impacts of industrial dairies on small and medium sized dairies, identify state policies to lessen impacts and produce public report no later than one year after effective date of Act. Creates Task Force on Dairy Animal Welfare. Requires task force to study animal welfare at industrial dairies. Allows task force to recommend minimum standards for animal welfare at industrial dairies. Requires task force to report to interim legislative committee related to agriculture no later than September 15, 2020. Sunsets task force December 31, 2020. Requires Environmental Quality Commission to annually report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly regarding whether specified activities regarding regulation of industrial dairies have occurred. Requires first report no later than September 15, 2021. Terminates further reporting if commission reports all specified activities have occurred. Repeals reporting requirement January 2, 2024. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to industrial dairies; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-15SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources.
2019-01-14SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback