OR SB1027 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows certain health care practitioner who receives needlestick injury during provision of medical care to patient who is unconscious or otherwise unable to consent to perform blood draw on patient for purpose of determining whether health care practitioner needs to begin any post-exposure prophylactic treatment. Allows certain health care practitioner who receives needlestick injury during provision of medical care to patient who is unconscious or otherwise unable to consent to test patient for human immunodeficiency virus] perform blood draw on patient for purpose of determining necessary course of treatment for] whether health care practitioner needs to begin any post-exposure prophylactic treatment. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to health care practitioners; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | Senate | Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Chapter 476, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 29. |
2019-06-04 | House | Third reading. Carried by Noble. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Clem, Hernandez, Speaker Kotek, Sprenger. |
2019-06-03 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-05-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-14 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-04-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |