OR SB1021 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Transportation to study design, cost and preliminary engineering of Interstate 5 Boone Bridge project. Directs Department of Transportation to add auxiliary lane on portion of Interstate 5 near City of Wilsonville and make seismic improvements to Boone Bridge.] Appropriates moneys to department, which may be expended for study, design and preliminary engineering. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to transportation; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Transportation, then Ways and Means. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |