OR SB1015 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-04 - Chapter 531, 2017 Laws.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that industrial hemp grower may transfer industrial hemp, and that industrial hemp handler may transfer industrial hemp concentrates and extracts, to marijuana processor licensed by Oregon Liquor Control Commission under certain circumstances. Provides that industrial hemp, industrial hemp concentrates and industrial hemp extracts may be processed and sold to other licensees of commission. Becomes operative January 1, 2018. Provides that person may not make retail sale of industrial hemp commodities or products in this state unless industrial hemp commodities or products and industrial hemp used to process those industrial hemp commodities or products meet same or substantially same requirements for processing industrial hemp commodities or products or growing industrial hemp under certain laws of this state. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to cannabis; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-04SenateChapter 531, 2017 Laws.
2017-07-04SenateEffective date, October 6, 2017.
2017-06-29SenateGovernor signed.
2017-06-26HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-06-23SenatePresident signed.
2017-06-22HouseThird reading. Carried by Wilson. Passed.Ayes, 45; Absent, 1--Barker; Excused, 3--Bentz, Boone, Hayden; Excused for Business of the House, 11--Esquivel, Helm, Lewis, Marsh, McKeown, McLain, Power, Reardon, Stark, Witt, Speaker Kotek.
2017-06-21HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 22, 2017 Calendar.
2017-06-20HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 21, 2017 Calendar.
2017-06-19HouseSecond reading.
2017-06-19HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2017-06-16HouseReferred to Marijuana Regulation.
2017-06-13HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2017-06-12SenateThird reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 3--Hansell, Olsen, Thomsen; excused, 1--Johnson.
2017-06-08SenateSecond reading.
2017-06-07SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2017-05-30SenateWork Session held.
2017-05-23SenatePublic Hearing held.
2017-05-09SenatePublic Hearing held.
2017-03-08SenateReferred to Marijuana Regulation.
2017-03-06SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback