OR SB1011 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that obligee spouse's conviction for attempted murder or conspiracy to commit murder of obligor spouse is change of circumstances for purposes of spousal support modification. Directs court, upon petition for dissolution of marriage or motion of obligor spouse, to deny] modify or terminate spousal support to obligee spouse upon obligee spouse's conviction for attempted murder or conspiracy to commit murder of obligor spouse.
Title
Relating to spousal support.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Chapter 354, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-03 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Boles, Keny-Guyer, Smith DB; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2019-05-30 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-13 | House | Work Session cancelled. |
2019-05-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-04-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Carried over to 04-24 by unanimous consent. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |