OR SB1011 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to influenza vaccinations; declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to influenza vaccinations; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-25 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2010-02-11 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-09 | Public Hearing held. | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Human Services and Rural Health Policy. | |
2010-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.or.us/searchmeas.html |
Text | http://www.leg.state.or.us/10ss1/measures/sb1000.dir/sb1011.intro.html |