OR SB101 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - Effective date, August 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-03 - Effective date, August 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to health care; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to health care; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-03 | Effective date, August 2, 2011. | |
2011-08-03 | Chapter 700, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-08-02 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-30 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-30 | President signed. | |
2011-06-29 | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 30. | |
2011-06-28 | Third reading. Carried by Freeman. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Clem. | |
2011-06-27 | Rules suspended. Second reading. | |
2011-06-27 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed C-Engrossed. | |
2011-06-27 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-23 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-06-23 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-06-23 | Third reading. Carried by Bates. Passed. Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Boquist, Starr. | |
2011-06-22 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-21 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) | |
2011-06-20 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-17 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2011-06-17 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-08 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. | |
2011-06-02 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2011-06-02 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-25 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. | |
2011-04-12 | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. | |
2011-04-12 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2011-04-06 | Work Session held. | |
2011-03-21 | Work Session held. | |
2011-03-02 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-14 | Referred to Health Care, Human Services and Rural Health Policy. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |