OR SB1008 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-23 - Effective date, August 15, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-23 - Effective date, August 15, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes State of Oregon to receive moneys pursuant to Volkswagen Environmental Mitigation Trust Agreement, deposit agreement moneys in Clean Diesel Engine Fund and use moneys to award grants for reducing emissions from school buses powered by diesel engines. Authorizes State of Oregon to receive moneys pursuant to Volkswagen Environmental Mitigation Trust Agreement, deposit agreement moneys in Clean Diesel Engine Fund and use moneys to award grants for reducing emissions from school buses powered by diesel engines. Prohibits Department of Environmental Quality from awarding grants from agreement moneys for any other purpose without prior approval from Legislative Assembly by law. Adds grants and loans for replacements to permissible uses of moneys in Clean Diesel Engine Fund. Makes other modifications to provisions for grants and loans from fund for purpose of reducing emissions from diesel engines. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating to diesel; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the B-Eng bill (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. Refer to Ways and Means. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Rules. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the B-Eng bill (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. Refer to Ways and Means. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Rules. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-23 | Senate | Effective date, August 15, 2017. |
2017-08-23 | Senate | Chapter 742, 2017 Laws. |
2017-08-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-07 | House | Third reading. Carried by Helm. Passed.Ayes, 55; Nays, 4--Nearman, Nosse, Post, Reschke; Excused, 1--Hayden. |
2017-07-06 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to July 7, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-07-06 | House | Second reading. |
2017-07-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-07-05 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-07-05 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-07-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Work Session cancelled. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Rules. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |