OR SB1005 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Speaker signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Adds two members to Task Force on School Safety. Establishes regulations for kratom products, including labeling requirements and minimum age for sale. Requires registration of kratom products with State Department of Agriculture. Provides civil cause of action for damages resulting from violation of kratom regulations. Authorizes imposition of civil penalty for certain violations. Creates crime of unlawful preparation, distribution, sale or offer for sale of kratom product. Punishes by maximum of 30 days' imprisonment, $1,250 fine, or both. Creates crime of unlawful distribution, sale or offer for sale to individual under 21 years of age. Punishes by maximum of 30 days' imprisonment, $1,250 fine, or both.] Directs task force to submit third report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to judiciary no later than September 1, 2021. Extends sunset of task force to December 31, 2021. Provides that provisions of chapter ___, Oregon Laws 2019 (Enrolled Senate Bill 1008), modifying prosecution and sentencing of juvenile offenders, do not apply to persons resentenced on or after January 1, 2020, who were originally sentenced before January 1, 2020. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to public safety; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-07-03SenatePresident signed.
2019-06-30HouseThird reading. Carried by Barker. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 4--Clem, Noble, Sprenger, Wallan.
2019-06-29HouseRules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to June 30, 2019 Calendar.
2019-06-29HouseRules suspended. Second reading.
2019-06-29HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2019-06-29HouseReferred to Ways and Means.
2019-06-29HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-06-29SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed.
2019-06-29SenateSecond reading.
2019-06-21SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2019-06-18SenateWork Session held.
2019-06-17SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2019-06-17SenateWork Session held.
2019-06-14SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2019-04-22SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2019-04-22SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.)
2019-04-09SenateWork Session held.
2019-04-08SenateWork Session held.
2019-04-05SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-06SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2019-03-04SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB1005
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1005/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1005/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1005/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1005/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1005/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB1005/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/28955
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/30081
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=478262

Bill Comments

feedback