OR SB10 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Public Hearing Scheduled.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Hearing: Apr 1 @ 3:00 pm in HR B
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes permissible density requirements within urban growth boundaries of cities within metropolitan service district or with population more than 10,000 for areas adjacent to transportation corridors and zoned to allow residential development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to development in priority transportation corridors.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled.
2019-02-25SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-20SenateReferred to Housing.
2019-02-19SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback