OR HR3 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Resolves that Representative Mike Nearman engaged in disorderly behavior. Resolves that Representative Mike Nearman engaged in disorderly behavior. Further resolves that, with concurrence of two-thirds of members of House of Representatives, Representative Nearman be expelled from House of Representatives.
Title
Resolving that House of Representatives finds Representative Mike Nearman engaged in disorderly behavior and expels Representative Nearman.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Kotek [D] | Rep. Paul Holvey [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | House | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2021-06-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-10 | House | Rules suspended. Read. Carried by Holvey. Adopted. Ayes, 59; Nays, 1--Nearman. |
2021-06-10 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2021-06-10 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-06-08 | House | Referred to December 21, 2020. |
2021-06-07 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |