OR HJR31 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-15)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-15)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution to vest power of impeachment of statewide elected Executive Branch officials in House of Representatives and power to try impeachments in Senate. Requires three-fifths majority vote of House of Representatives to deliver impeachment resolution to Senate and two-thirds majority vote of Senate for conviction. Limits judgment to removal from office and disqualification from holding other public office. Refers proposed amendment to people for approval or rejection at next regular general election held throughout this state.
Title
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to the impeachment of statewide elected Executive Branch officials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - House - House Read and Adopted (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - House - House Committee Be Adopted (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Motion to withdraw from committee on Rules failed.Ayes, 10; nays, 18--Bates, Beyer, Burdick, Dembrow, Devlin, Edwards, Gelser, Hass, Johnson, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Prozanski, Riley, Roblan, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward, President Courtney; excused, 2--Boquist, Olsen. |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2015-05-20 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-05-19 | House | Read. Carried by Hack, Hoyle. Adopted.Ayes, 47; Nays, 12--Barker, Barnhart, Barton, Boone, Buckley, Gilliam, Greenlick, Holvey, Lininger, Smith, Smith Warner, Witt; Excused, 1--Sprenger. |
2015-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 19, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-05-13 | House | Recommendation: Be adopted. |
2015-05-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2015-03-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |