OR HJR29 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution to require not guilty criminal jury verdicts in circuit court to be unanimous. Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution to require not guilty criminal jury verdicts in circuit court to be unanimous. Refers proposed amendment to people for their approval or rejection at next regular general election.
Title
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to unanimous jury verdicts.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Diehl [R] | Rep. Tracy Cramer [R] | Rep. Emily McIntire [R] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] |
Rep. Werner Reschke [R] | Rep. Brian Stout [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-17 - House - House Withdraw from Committee (Y: 25 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-05-17 | House | Motion to withdraw from Rules failed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 35--Andersen, Bowman, Bynum, Chaichi, Dexter, Evans, Fahey, Gamba, Gomberg, Grayber, Hartman, Helm, Holvey, Hudson, Kropf, Levy E, Lively, Marsh, McLain, Nathanson, Nelson, Neron, Nguyen D, Nguyen H, Nosse, Pham H, Pham K, Reynolds, Ruiz, Sanchez, Sosa, Tran, Valderrama, Walters, Speaker Rayfield. |
2023-03-16 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2023-03-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |