OR HJR23 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution imposing tax on property, providing that tax is not subject to sections 11 or 11b, Article XI, of Oregon Constitution, providing that revenues from tax must be deposited in emergency resilience fund, providing that moneys in fund may be used only for emergency resilience projects, and repealing provisions June 30, 2040. Refers proposed amendment to people for their approval or rejection at next regular general election.
Title
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to imposition of tax on property for deposit in emergency resilience fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Revenue with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-03-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HJR23 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HJR23/Introduced |