OR HJR21 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to voter registration.
Title
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to voter registration.
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Bonamici [D] | Rep. Ben Cannon [D] | Rep. Dave Hunt [D] | Sen. Diane Rosenbaum [D] |
Rep. Jefferson Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2011-02-23 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-02-08 | Referred to Rules. | |
2011-02-01 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.or.us/searchmeas.html |
Text | http://www.leg.state.or.us/11reg/measures/hjr1.dir/hjr0021.intro.html |