OR HJR203 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on March 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution authorizing new state real property transfer charge or increase in rate of existing state real property transfer charge if state law imposing charge or increase provides for exemption of first $500,000 of taxable value of real property and revenue is used exclusively to fund or finance affordable housing in this state. Requires state law imposing new charge or increasing rate of existing charge to contain definition of "affordable housing." Allows Legislative Assembly to adjust exemption amount to account for inflation. Refers proposed amendment to people for their approval or rejection at next regular general election held throughout this state.
Title
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to funding affordable housing.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2020-02-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Revenue with subsequent referral to Rules. |
2020-02-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2020-01-27 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2020R1/Measures/Overview/HJR203 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2020R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HJR203/Introduced |